Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Muñoz y Herrera

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1835Born
17 Dec 185924.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 189054.7SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
26 Jun 189054.7ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
12 Oct 189055.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
2 Dec 189560.1AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
26 Dec 191984.2DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Muñoz y Herrera (VIAF: 89218591)
Bishop Juan Muñoz y Herrera (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntequera
Ordained BishopGranada, Archdiocese of Granada

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 70, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017