Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximiliano Fernández del Rincón y Soto Dávila

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1835Born
1 Jun 189155.7AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
23 Aug 189156.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
21 May 189458.7AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
24 Jul 190771.9DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Maximiliano Fernández del Rincón y Soto Dávila (VIAF: 66383111)
Bishop Maximiliano Fernández del Rincón y Soto Dávila (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaén, Diocese of Jaén
Ordained BishopGranada, Archdiocese of Granada

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 294, and Page 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017