Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel María León González y Sánchez

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1825BornSevilla
22 Feb 185024.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 187650.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
28 Jan 187650.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
14 May 187650.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
7 May 187751.8SelectedBishop of Jaén, Spain
22 Jun 187751.9ConfirmedBishop of Jaén, Spain
20 Oct 189671.3DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel María León González y Sánchez:
Bishop Manuel María León González y Sánchez (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286, and Page 602
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 45, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015