Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildefonso Joaquín Infante y Macías, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1813Born
1838¹24.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 May 187662.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ceuta, Spain
23 May 187662.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
18 Jun 187663.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
4 Mar 187763.7SelectedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
20 Mar 187763.8ConfirmedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
14 Jan 188268.6ResignedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
2 Jul 188875.0DiedBishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso Joaquín Infante y Macías
Bishop Ildefonso Joaquín Infante y Macías O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoguer, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cádiz, Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 203, and Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 513
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 46, Number 36
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017