Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antolín Cardinal Monescillo y Viso

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1811Born
14 Jun 186149.7SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
22 Jul 186149.8ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
6 Oct 186150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
28 Oct 186453.1SelectedBishop of Jaén, Spain
27 Mar 186553.5ConfirmedBishop of Jaén, Spain
7 May 187765.6SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
22 Jun 187765.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
5 Oct 187867.0InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
10 Nov 188473.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jun 188674.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
11 Apr 189280.6SelectedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
11 Jul 189280.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
11 Aug 189785.9DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antolín Monescillo y Viso (VIAF: 77602529)
Antolín Cardinal Monescillo y Viso (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorral de Calatrava, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopSalesian Monastery of the Visitation, Madrid
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Bienaventurada Virgen María del Sagrario, Chapel, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 35.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 170, and Page 286
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 558, and Page 579
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Nov 1884
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 168, Number 925
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017