Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Hüe y Gutiérrez

Deceased

Bishop of Tui, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1834Born
May 1858³23.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 188147.6SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
27 Mar 188247.8ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
2 Jul 188248.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
15 Mar 189459.8DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Hüe y Gutiérrez (VIAF: 87057630)
Bishop Fernando Hüe y Gutiérrez (born , died ) Bishop of Tui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZahara, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopS. Paul, Seville, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 571
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017