Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Marcelo Cardinal Spínola y Maestre

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1835Born
20 Feb 186429.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
21 Mar 186429.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
16 Dec 188045.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
16 Dec 188045.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Milo
6 Feb 188146.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milo
10 Nov 188449.8AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
10 Jun 188651.4AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
2 Dec 189560.8AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
11 Dec 190570.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jan 190671.0DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Mar 1987Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Marcelo Spínola y Maestre (VIAF: 57758002)
Bl. Marcelo Cardinal Spínola y Maestre (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsle of San Fernando, Diocese of Cádiz
Ordained PriestArchiepiscopal Placa, Chapel, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Death PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Buried Place (Original)Sagrario of the Cathedral, Crypt, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Buried Place (Current)Dolores Chapel, Cathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
  • a cardinal for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 194, and Page 309
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 361, and Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 8
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Dec 1905

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017