Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Miguel Gómez Alguacil y Fernández

Deceased

Archbishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1814Born
10 Mar 187662.1SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
3 Apr 187662.1ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
13 Aug 187662.5Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
30 Nov 188066.8SelectedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
16 Dec 188066.8ConfirmedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
30 Dec 188975.9AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
25 Mar 189076.1InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
14 Sep 189177.6DiedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Miguel Gómez Alguacil y Fernández (VIAF: 306350930)
Archbishop Mariano Miguel Gómez Alguacil y Fernández (born , died ) Archbishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervera de Rio Pisuerga, Diocese of León
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 510, and Page 580
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 590
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 46, Number 37
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017