Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria de Urquinaona y Vidot

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1813Born
23 Sep 183724.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 186854.7SelectedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
22 Jun 186854.7ConfirmedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 Mar 186955.5Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
15 Jul 187864.8AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
31 Mar 188369.5DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Maria de Urquinaona y Vidot (VIAF: 259664407)
Bishop José Maria de Urquinaona y Vidot (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCádiz, Diocese of Cádiz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cádiz, Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 177
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 39, Number 4
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017