Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Morgades y Gili

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1826Born
25 Jan 188255.2SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
27 Mar 188255.4ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
16 Jul 188255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
19 Jun 189972.6AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
8 Jan 190174.2DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Morgades y Gili (VIAF: 155033462)
Bishop José Morgades y Gili (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilafranca del Penedès, Diocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 589
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017