Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gomez (Comes) y Vidal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1844Born
21 Sep 186925.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 189046.0AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
16 Nov 189046.3Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
25 Jun 189652.0AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
30 Nov 190561.4ResignedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
20 Jul 190662.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Gomez (Comes) y Vidal
Bishop Juan Gomez (Comes) y Vidal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teruel (-Albarracín)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManresa, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Menorca, Diocese of Menorca

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 387, and Page 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017