Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Meseguer y Costa

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1843BornVallibobo
21 Dec 186724.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188946.1AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
19 Mar 189046.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
27 Mar 190561.4AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
9 Dec 192077.1DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Meseguer y Costa:
Archbishop José Meseguer y Costa (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 320
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013