Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Ríu y Cabanas

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1852Born
1875¹22.5Ordained PriestPriest of Solsona, Spain
15 Jul 189543.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Solsona, Spain
15 Jul 189543.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamasus
8 Sep 189543.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamasus
18 Apr 190148.8AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
27 Dec 190149.5DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Ríu y Cabanas
Bishop Ramón Ríu y Cabanas (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolsona, Diocese of Solsona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Solsona, Diocese of Solsona

  • a priest for 26.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 534, and Page 576
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017