Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Torras y Bages

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1846Born
23 Dec 187125.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 189952.7AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
10 Dec 189953.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
7 Feb 191669.4DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Torras y Bages (VIAF: 22137364)
Bishop José Torras y Bages (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Cabanyas, Diocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopMontserrat
Death PlaceVic, Diocese of Vic

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 589
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017