Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Badía y Sarradell

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1865Born
5 Apr 188014.9Ordained PriestPriest of Urgell, Spain
26 Jan 190337.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
26 Jan 190337.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
17 May 190338.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
3 Jul 190742.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barbastro, Spain
27 Jul 191752.2AppointedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
1 Oct 192661.4DiedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Badía y Sarradell
Bishop Isidoro Badía y Sarradell (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona (-Tudela)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsona

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1903, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast