Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Laguarda y Fenollera

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1866Born
19 Jun 189933.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
19 Jun 189933.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
15 Oct 189933.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
9 Jun 190236.1AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
6 Dec 190640.6AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
20 Jan 190942.7SelectedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
29 Apr 190943.0ConfirmedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
4 Dec 191347.6DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Laguarda y Fenollera (VIAF: 306348821)
Bishop Juan José Laguarda y Fenollera (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 556, and Page 576
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017