Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvador Castellote y Pinazo

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1846Born
25 Jun 189650.2AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
4 Oct 189650.5Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
16 Dec 190155.7AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
6 Dec 190660.7AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
23 Dec 190660.7DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Castellote y Pinazo (VIAF: 87826095)
Archbishop Salvador Castellote y Pinazo (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Death PlaceJaén, Diocese of Jaén

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286, and Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017