Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Blanco Barón

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1845Born
1869¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 189550.5SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
2 Dec 189550.6ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
26 Apr 189651.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
4 Apr 189751.9DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José María Blanco Barón
Bishop José María Blanco Barón (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbastro, Diocese of Barbastro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017