Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antolín López y Peláez

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1866Born
1889¹22.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 190438.2AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
4 Apr 190538.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
18 Jul 191346.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
23 Dec 191852.3DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antolín López y Peláez
Archbishop Antolín López y Peláez (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManzanal del Puerto

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast