Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timoteo Hernández y Mulas

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1856Born
1882¹25.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 190751.3AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
26 Apr 190851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
19 Mar 192164.5DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timoteo Hernández y Mulas
Bishop Timoteo Hernández y Mulas (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorales del Vino

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018