Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zacarías Martínez y Núñez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1864BornBaños de Valdearados
28 Aug 188823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
4 Dec 191854.1AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
15 Jun 191954.6Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
14 Dec 192258.1AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
2 Dec 192763.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
6 Sep 193368.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Zacarías Martínez y Núñez:
Archbishop Zacarías Martínez y Núñez O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013