Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Enciso Viana

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1906BornLa Guardia
15 Jun 192822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
12 Oct 194943.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
12 Oct 194943.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
2 Feb 195044.0AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
16 Apr 195044.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
30 May 195549.3AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
21 Sep 196458.6DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Enciso Viana:
Bishop Jesús Enciso Viana (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015