Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luciano Rubio, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prior General Emeritus of Order of St. Augustine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1909Born
24 Sep 192516.3ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
17 Dec 193223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
29 Sep 195950.3AppointedPrior General of Order of St. Augustine
Aug 196556.2ResignedPrior General of Order of St. Augustine
22 Nov 199788.5DiedPrior General Emeritus of Order of St. Augustine

MicroData Summary for Luciano Rubio
Father Luciano Rubio O.S.A. (born , died ) Prior General Emeritus of Order of St. Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlacePosasa de Omaņa, Spain

  • a priest for 64.9 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018