Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago García Aracil

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1940Born
21 Sep 196323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
20 Nov 198444.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
20 Nov 198444.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
27 Dec 198444.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
31 May 198848.0AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
9 Jul 200464.1AppointedArchbishop of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain
21 May 201575.0RetiredArchbishop of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain
28 Dec 201878.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Santiago García Aracil (VIAF: 7126766)
Archbishop Santiago García Aracil (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida-Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 May 2015
  • d: CB, 28 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Dec 2018

Quantcast