Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Cerro Chaves

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1957 Born
12 Jul 198123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
199234.2IncardinatedPriest of Valladolid, Spain
21 Jun 200749.6AppointedBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain
2 Sep 200749.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain
27 Dec 201962.1AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
29 Feb 202062.3InstalledArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Cerro Chaves
Archbishop Francisco Cerro Chaves (born ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalpartida de Cáceres
Ordained BishopPlaza, Cathedral, Coria, Diocese of Coria-Cáceres

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Toledo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,500
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 1 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jul 2020

Quantcast