Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luís Miguel Muñoz Cárdaba

Apostolic Nuncio to Sudan

Titular Archbishop of Nasai

Apostolic Nuncio to Eritrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1965 Born
28 Jun 199226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
31 Mar 202054.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sudan
31 Mar 202054.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Eritrea
31 Mar 202054.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nasai
25 Jul 202054.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nasai

MicroData Summary for Luís Miguel Muñoz Cárdaba
Archbishop Luís Miguel Muñoz Cárdaba (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Sudan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallelado, Diocese of Segovia, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Sudan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2020
  • c1: CB, 31 Mar 2020
  • ob: CB, 11 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 2 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Jul 2020

Quantcast