Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael González Moralejo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huelva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1918BornValencia
29 Jun 194527.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 195839.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Feb 195839.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
4 May 195839.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
28 Nov 196951.5AppointedBishop of Huelva, Spain
27 Oct 199375.4RetiredBishop of Huelva, Spain
29 May 200486.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Huelva, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael González Moralejo:
Bishop Rafael González Moralejo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huelva

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015