Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Méndez Asensio

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1921Born
13 Apr 194625.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 196847.3AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
3 Sep 196847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
3 Dec 197150.7AppointedArchbishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
31 Jan 197856.8AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
10 Dec 199675.7RetiredArchbishop of Granada, Spain
15 Apr 200685.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Méndez Asensio
Archbishop José Méndez Asensio (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVélez Rubio

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018