Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García-Santacruz Ortiz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guadix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1933BornNavahermosa
26 May 195623.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 199259.2AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
14 Jun 199259.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
3 Dec 200976.9RetiredBishop of Guadix, Spain
12 Mar 201178.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan García-Santacruz Ortiz:
Bishop Juan García-Santacruz Ortiz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guadix

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,684
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013