Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal Alvarez Martínez

Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” a Monte Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1925 BornSanta Eulalia de Ferrońes Llanera
11 Jun 195024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oviedo, Spain
13 Apr 197347.7AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
3 Jun 197347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
20 Dec 197651.4AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logrońo, Spain
12 May 198963.8AppointedBishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
23 Jun 199569.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
21 Feb 200175.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200175.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” a Monte Verde
24 Oct 200277.3RetiredArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Alvarez Martínez:
Cardinal Francisco Alvarez Martínez (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Toledo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 15 Sep 2013