Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 聲gel Rubio Castro

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1939 BornGuadalupe
26 Jul 196425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
21 Oct 200465.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
21 Oct 200465.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vergi
12 Dec 200465.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vergi
3 Nov 200768.6AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
9 Dec 200768.7InstalledBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Rubio Castro:
Bishop 聲gel Rubio Castro (born ) Bishop of Segovia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Segovia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,725
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2007
  • i: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013