Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Fernández Collado

Bishop of Albacete, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1952 Born
10 Jul 197725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
28 Jun 201361.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Jun 201361.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Iliturgi
15 Sep 201361.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iliturgi
25 Sep 201866.3AppointedBishop of Albacete, Spain
17 Nov 201866.4InstalledBishop of Albacete, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ángel Fernández Collado (VIAF: 9939083)
Bishop Ángel Fernández Collado (born ) Bishop of Albacete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Cerralbos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Albacete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Jul 2013
  • c34: CB, 15 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,872
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast