Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón del Hoyo López

Bishop Emeritus of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1940 BornArlanzón
5 Sep 196525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
26 Jun 199655.8AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
15 Sep 199656.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
19 May 200564.7AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
2 Jul 200564.8InstalledBishop of Jaén, Spain
9 Apr 201675.5RetiredBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón del Hoyo López
Bishop Ramón del Hoyo López (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaén

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jaén.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,792
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Apr 2016