Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebio Ignacio Hernández Sola, O.A.R.

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1944 BornCárcar (Navarra)
30 Aug 196420.1ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
30 Aug 196723.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
7 Jul 196823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
29 Jan 201166.5AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
19 Mar 201166.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Eusebio Ignacio Hernández Sola:
Bishop Eusebio Ignacio Hernández Sola O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of Tarazona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarazona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,970

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013