Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Benavent Escuín

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Spain, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1914Born
18 Jul 194329.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 195440.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Málaga, Spain
6 Dec 195440.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cercina
13 Feb 195540.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cercina
13 Feb 196045.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Málaga, Spain
30 Sep 196652.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Málaga, Spain
7 Apr 196752.9AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
26 Aug 196854.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Granada, Spain
26 Aug 196854.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tiburnia
3 Feb 197459.8SucceededArchbishop of Granada, Spain
25 May 197763.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Spain, Military
25 May 197763.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Maximiana in Numidia
27 Oct 198268.5ResignedBishop of Spain, Military
7 Mar 199883.9ResignedTitular Archbishop of Maximiana in Numidia
4 Jan 200893.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Spain, Military

MicroData Summary for Emilio Benavent Escuín
Archbishop Emilio Benavent Escuín (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Spain, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 52.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,955, Number 11
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 495, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 842, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast