Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julián de Diego y García Alcolea

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1859BornHontanares
24 Sep 188122.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 190445.7AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
5 Feb 190546.0Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
18 Jul 191354.4AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
27 Jul 192364.4AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
8 Oct 192566.6AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
16 Jan 192767.9DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián de Diego y García Alcolea:
Archbishop Julián de Diego y García Alcolea (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013