Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Senso Lázaro

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1868Born
1891¹22.8Ordained PriestPriest of Badajoz, Spain
18 Jul 191345.4AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
22 Nov 191345.7Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
21 Aug 194173.5DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Senso Lázaro
Bishop Antonio Senso Lázaro (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontáchez

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 69
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 70
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast