Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Miranda y Ristuer

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1853Born
22 Sep 187723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Segovia, Spain
12 Nov 190349.9AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Feb 190450.1Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
14 Nov 190450.9AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
24 Jun 191359.5DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián Miranda y Ristuer
Bishop Julián Miranda y Ristuer (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegovia

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 3
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast