Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Supervía y Lostalé

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1835Born
17 Dec 185924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zaragoza, Spain
1 Jun 188853.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
1 Jun 188853.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
26 Aug 188853.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
2 Dec 189560.6AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
15 Jan 191882.7DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Supervía y Lostalé
Bishop Mariano Supervía y Lostalé (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTauste, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Pilar, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 266, and Page 429
  • c2+: CB, 19 Feb 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017