Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Lozano Torreira

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1814Born
14 Sep 186550.7SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
8 Jan 186651.0ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
22 Apr 186651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
4 Jul 189176.5DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Lozano Torreira
Bishop Juan Lozano Torreira (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,709
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 435
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 173, Number 952
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017