Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesáreo Rodrigo y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1819Born
15 Sep 187556.5SelectedBishop of Orense, Spain
23 Sep 187556.5ConfirmedBishop of Orense, Spain
6 Feb 187656.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
1895¹75.8DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesáreo Rodrigo y Rodríguez
Bishop Cesáreo Rodrigo y Rodríguez (born , died 1895) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoculina, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 44, Number 29
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017