Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Palacios y López

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1818Born
1847²28.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 187758.9SelectedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
25 Jun 187759.0ConfirmedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
20 Jan 187859.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
2 Dec 188567.4DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Palacios y López
Bishop José Manuel Palacios y López (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018