Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Inguanzo Rivero

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1764BornLlanes
1814¹49.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 181449.6SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
26 Sep 181449.7ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
12 Feb 181550.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
29 Jun 182459.5SelectedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
27 Sep 182459.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
20 Dec 182459.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Feb 183166.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
30 Jan 183671.1DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Inguanzo Rivero:
Pedro Cardinal Inguanzo Rivero (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 2
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 402, and Page 372
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 130, Number 694
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015