Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pérez de Hirias

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1761Born
1787¹25.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 182564.1SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
27 Jun 182564.4ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
18 Sep 182564.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
18 Dec 184281.9DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pérez de Hirias
Bishop Antonio Pérez de Hirias (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdeolivas

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,657
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 143, Number 776
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018