Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Apolinar Serrano Díez

Deceased

Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1833Born
22 Sep 186027.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 186027.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 187542.0SelectedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
23 Sep 187542.1ConfirmedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
21 Nov 187542.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
15 Jun 187642.8DiedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Apolinar Serrano Díez
Bishop Apolinar Serrano Díez (born , died ) Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillarramiel de Campos, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 42, Number 17
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017