Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Anselmo Nafría

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1784BornTorre de Blacos
1809¹24.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 184863.6SelectedBishop of Coria, Spain
17 Jan 184863.7ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
9 Jul 184864.2Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
28 Jan 185166.7DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Anselmo Nafría:
Bishop Manuel Anselmo Nafría (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,500
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 155, Number 850

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015