Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anacleto Meoro y Sánchez

Deceased

Bishop of Almería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1778BornGranátula de Calatrava
12 Sep 184769.1SelectedBishop of Almería, Spain
17 Dec 184769.4ConfirmedBishop of Almería, Spain
9 Apr 184869.7Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
2 Jan 186485.4DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Anacleto Meoro y Sánchez (VIAF: 168899766)
Bishop Anacleto Meoro y Sánchez (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,497
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 154, Number 842
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Dec 2016