Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Rodríguez y Obregón

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1780BornValladolid
12 Sep 184766.8SelectedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
17 Dec 184767.0ConfirmedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
14 May 184867.4Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
4 Jan 185372.1DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Rodríguez y Obregón:
Bishop Francisco Javier Rodríguez y Obregón (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 432
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 155, Number 846

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013