Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gilberto Ruiz Capucín y Feijó

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1780Born
11 Jun 180827.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 184767.1SelectedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
17 Dec 184767.4ConfirmedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
9 Apr 184867.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
9 Oct 184868.2DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Gilberto Ruiz Capucín y Feijó
Bishop Juan Gilberto Ruiz Capucín y Feijó (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalahorra

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,498
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 154, Number 843
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,848, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast