Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Escolano y Fenoi

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1805BornGranada
22 Sep 182722.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 182924.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 184742.6SelectedBishop of Jaén, Spain
17 Dec 184742.8ConfirmedBishop of Jaén, Spain
23 Apr 184843.2Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
21 Jul 185449.4DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Escolano y Fenoi:
Bishop José Escolano y Fenoi (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,226
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 154, Number 845

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015